California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 19, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024