|
07/18/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 148, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6147.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4848.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4793.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|