California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 18, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 30, 2024