Assembly
|
09/22/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 5431.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|