California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Amended

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024