|
09/23/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 3037.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2402.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 889.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|