California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2023

Amended

Bill August 23, 2023
Bill June 5, 2023