|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5558.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|