California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill June 13, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024