LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2328
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2328
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2328
Action History
Assembly
04/23/2024
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/16/2024
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
04/03/2024
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Assembly
03/04/2024
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED.
Assembly
02/13/2024
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
Assembly
02/12/2024
Read first time. To print.