California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill August 14, 2024
Bill August 5, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024