|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 966, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 8. Page 5295.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|