California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024