|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 406, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|