|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 968, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5315.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|