California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill May 30, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024