|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 275, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 4.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5091.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|