California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2553 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2024

Amended

Bill August 13, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024