|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 238, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5183.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5108.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|