|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 13.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 10. Page 5429.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|