California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2642 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024