|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5445.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|