California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2723 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024