Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5504.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|