California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2774 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Amended

Bill June 24, 2024
Bill June 5, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024