|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 735, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2369.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1461.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|