California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023