Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Smallwood-Cuevas.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5163.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|