California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2833 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Amended

Bill June 13, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024