|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 247, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4999.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|