California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill August 12, 2024
Bill May 29, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024