|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5445.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|