California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 14, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024