Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 3. Page 3231.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 2557.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 4. Page 1998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|