California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 3, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023