|
09/26/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1484.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|