California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2023

Amended

Bill March 2, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023