Assembly
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 7. Page 5554.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|