California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024