Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 3592.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2788.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 1750.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|