California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB309 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 13, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023