Assembly
|
09/29/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4782.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|