|
09/14/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5090.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|