California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 4, 2024