Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|