|
09/20/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|