California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2024

Amended

Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024