|
05/22/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 8, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1542.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1048.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 827.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 1.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|