California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023