|
09/26/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 235, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3072.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2391.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1950.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|